Global Patent Index - EP 0876427 B1

EP 0876427 B1 2002-09-25 - POLYOLEFIN ELASTOMER BLENDS EXHIBITING IMPROVED PROPERTIES

Title (en)

POLYOLEFIN ELASTOMER BLENDS EXHIBITING IMPROVED PROPERTIES

Title (de)

POLYOLEFINELASTOMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERBESSERTEN EIGENSCHAFTEN

Title (fr)

MELANGES D'ELASTOMERES POLYOLEOFINIQUES PRESENTANT DES PROPRIETES AMELIOREES

Publication

EP 0876427 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97903105 A

Priority

  • US 9701180 W
  • US 1030396 P
  • US 1343096 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9726297A1] Polymer mixtures are disclosed which comprise at least one homogeneously branched ethylene polymer (A) and at least one ethylene polymer (B) having a crystallinity which is at least 7 percent greater than the crystallinity of polymer (A) with certain provisos. A process for making a molded article using the disclosed polymer mixtures is disclosed as well as films, film layers, coatings and molded articles formed from those mixtures. These mixtures have several advantages over polymer compositions of the prior art, including improved properties at elevated temperatures such as improved softening point under load, improved hardness, improved toughness, improved 100 percent modulus of elasticity, improved compression set, improved ability to prevent oil bleed out at lower temperatures when the mixture contains oil and reduced injection molding cycle time. The mixtures retain their performance advantages even when substantial amounts of additives such as oil and filler are incorporated into the mixture. The mixtures may also be cross-linked after they are formed into the shape of an article to form vulcanized elastomeric products. The polymer mixtures have utility in a variety of applications.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08L 23/16; C08L 23/04; C08L 23/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08L 23/04 (2006.01); C08L 23/08 (2006.01); C08L 91/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08L 23/0815 (2013.01); C08L 91/00 (2013.01); C08L 2205/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08L 23/0815 + C08L 2666/06
  2. C08L 23/0815 + C08L 2666/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9726297 A1 19970724; AR 012814 A1 20001122; AT 224929 T 20021015; AU 1709597 A 19970811; AU 716317 B2 20000224; BR 9707298 A 19990720; CA 2243852 A1 19970724; CA 2243852 C 20061107; CN 1111563 C 20030618; CN 1209828 A 19990303; CZ 9802308 A3 19981216; DE 69715818 D1 20021031; DE 69715818 T2 20030618; DE 876427 T1 19990506; EP 0876427 A1 19981111; EP 0876427 B1 20020925; ES 2123484 T1 19990116; ES 2123484 T3 20030216; HU 9900394 A2 19990528; HU 9900394 A3 20000828; JP 2000503332 A 20000321; JP 3840499 B2 20061101; KR 100445310 B1 20041015; MX 9805832 A 19981031; NO 320562 B1 20051219; NO 983357 A 19980922; NO 983357 D0 19980721; PL 327988 A1 19990104; PT 876427 E 20030131; TR 199801405 T2 19981021; TW 406107 B 20000921; US 6005053 A 19991221

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160122

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20170616

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170121

2017-02-15 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170121

2017-01-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69715818

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160122

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151208

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69715818

- Representative's name: CASALONGA & PARTNERS, DE

2015-12-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140123

2015-04-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150407

2015-01-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140123

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-23 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-08-20 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THE *DOW CHEMICAL CY

- Effective date: 20140131

2013-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130114

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130110

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130114

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130207

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120122

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 224929 T

- Effective date: 20120122

2012-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120723

2012-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120122

2012-07-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20120723

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20110103

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110112

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-11-12 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2123484 T3

2003-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021121

2003-01-22 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030122

2002-12-25 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021225

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715818 20021031

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-25 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224929 T 20021015

1999-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991105

1999-05-06 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1999-03-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1999-01-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2123484 T1

1999-01-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980824

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE