Global Patent Index - EP 0876579 B1

EP 0876579 B1 2000-11-15 - AERIAL TARGET SYSTEM

Title (en)

AERIAL TARGET SYSTEM

Title (de)

IN DER LUFT FLIEGENDES ZIEL

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE CIBLE AERIENNE

Publication

EP 0876579 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97900277 A

Priority

  • GB 9700024 W
  • GB 9601207 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9727446A1] A thermally conductive surface (22) of an aerial target (1) is heated using a liquid petroleum gas burner (18) to a sufficient temperature to provide a thermal signature for acquisition by an infrared seeking air defence weapon system. The liquid petroleum gas burner (18) generates a flame which is directed against the thermally conductive surface (22) which then radiates an infrared signature. In the preferred embodiment, the liquid petroleum gas burner (18) is housed within a thermal unit (3) which forms the nose-cone of the aerial target (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41J 2/02; F41J 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41J 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41J 2/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

GB 2309290 A 19970723; GB 2309290 B 19971210; GB 9700145 D0 19970226; AU 1386897 A 19970820; DE 69703532 D1 20001221; DE 69703532 T2 20010315; EP 0876579 A1 19981111; EP 0876579 B1 20001115; FR 2743876 A1 19970725; FR 2743876 B1 19980410; GB 9601207 D0 19960320; WO 9727446 A1 19970731

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69703532

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151229

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-01-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703532 20001221

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2000-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990209

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990209

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980703

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT