Global patent index - EP 0876784 A3

EP 0876784 A3 2000-03-15 - Upholstered sitting furniture

Title (en)

Upholstered sitting furniture

Title (de)

Gepolstertes Sitzmöbel

Title (fr)

Meuble d'assise rembourré

Publication

EP 0876784 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98890131 A

Priority

AT 28997 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0876784A2] The chair includes a main body (1) having at least two plug-in plates (2) at the side and or back with the arm-rests (7,8) and or backrest (6) having matching counter-plates. The plug-in plates are in the form of moulding plates forming conically downward leading and top open openings. The plates on the arm rests and or back rest are identical but point in the opposite direction. The underside of the main body has a swivel-out plug-in plate. A further body has a locking piece co-operating with the plug-in plate, on its underside.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 13/00; A47C 7/40; A47C 7/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/40 (2006.01); A47C 7/54 (2006.01); A47C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/546 (2013.01); A47C 7/40 (2013.01); A47C 13/005 (2013.01); A47C 15/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0876784 A2 19981111; EP 0876784 A3 20000315; AT 2045 U1 19980427

INPADOC legal status

2001-06-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-12-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47C 13/00 A, 7A 47C 7/40 B, 7A 47C 7/54 B, 7A 47C 7/42 B, 7A 47C 1/124 B, 7A 47C 7/58 B

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI