Global Patent Index - EP 0876788 B1

EP 0876788 B1 2002-11-06 - U-shaped profile, with wall support, for a partition

Title (en)

U-shaped profile, with wall support, for a partition

Title (de)

Mit einem Wandhalter versehenes, im Querschnitt U-förmiges Halteprofil für eine Trennwand

Title (fr)

Profilé en U, avec support mural, pour cloison

Publication

EP 0876788 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98106300 A

Priority

DE 19719013 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0876788A2] The holder (1) includes a glass panel clamped between the U-sides (4,5) of the holder by an adjusting element generating clamping force. The bridge piece (13) of the holder, on its end surface (14) facing away from the U-sides has connections for detachably connecting it to the wall-holder (2) part of the profiled holder. The connections have bar-shaped protuberances (16) matching counter-profiled pieces (15) on the wall holder, and recesses (17). The bridge piece over part of its width and the U-arm over parts of its length, are hollow or solid, in the transition between the first U-arm and the bridge piece. The wall (29) facing the second U arm and next to the hollow or solid profile (28) has a threaded hole (30) for a screw (31) going through the second U arm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/28; E06B 3/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/30 (2006.01); E06B 3/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/5454 (2013.01); A47K 3/30 (2013.01); A47K 2003/307 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0876788 A2 19981111; EP 0876788 A3 19990811; EP 0876788 B1 20021106; DE 19719013 A1 19981112; DE 19719013 C2 20021107

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060407

2005-05-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050520

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-10 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050510

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050407

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DORMA G.M.B.H. + CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040407

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030402

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-03-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030317

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030313

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806144 20021212

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227101 T 20021115

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47K 3/28 A, 7E 06B 3/54 B

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020305

2000-04-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000211

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6A 47K 3/22 A, 6E 06B 3/54 B

1999-03-05 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1999-02-24 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI