Global Patent Index - EP 0876812 A3

EP 0876812 A3 2000-07-26 - Cosmetic compositions comprising saccharic acid ureides

Title (en)

Cosmetic compositions comprising saccharic acid ureides

Title (de)

Zuckersäureureide enthaltende kosmetische Zubereitungen

Title (fr)

Compositions cosmétiques comprenant des uréides des acides sacchariques

Publication

EP 0876812 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98107385 A

Priority

DE 19719006 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0876812A2] Use of sugar acid ureides of formula (R1)(R2)NC(=O)N(R3)(R4) (I) in cosmetic compositions is new. R1 = a sugar acid residue (optionally hydroxy protected); R2 = 1-20C acyl or alkyl, 2-10C alkenyl; or 3-10C cycloalkenyl or cycloalkyl or aryl (each optionally substituted); R3, R4 = H, 1-20C acyl or alkyl, 2-10C alkenyl; or 3-10C cycloalkenyl or cycloalkyl or aryl (each optionally substituted); or a sugar acid residue. Also claimed are (I) in which the sugar acid is ribonic, arabonic, gluconic, galactonic, glucuronic, galacturonic, gulonic or keto-gulonic acid (all optionally hydroxy protected).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/48; C07C 273/02; C07H 7/033

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/30 (2006.01); A61K 8/36 (2006.01); A61K 8/365 (2006.01); A61K 8/40 (2006.01); A61K 8/42 (2006.01); A61K 8/60 (2006.01); A61Q 17/04 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01); C07C 273/02 (2006.01); C07C 273/18 (2006.01); C07C 275/50 (2006.01); C07H 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07H 13/12 (2013.01); A61K 8/42 (2013.01); A61K 8/60 (2013.01); A61Q 19/00 (2013.01); A61Q 17/04 (2013.01); A61Q 19/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0876812 A2 19981111; EP 0876812 A3 20000726; CN 1198326 A 19981111; DE 19719006 A1 19981112; JP H10316525 A 19981202

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 7/48 A, 7C 07C 273/02 B, 7C 07H 7/033 B

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI