Global Patent Index - EP 0876851 B1

EP 0876851 B1 2001-12-05 - Optoelectronic grading device

Title (en)

Optoelectronic grading device

Title (de)

Optoelektronische Klassiervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de classement optoélectronique

Publication

EP 0876851 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98108295 A

Priority

DE 19719698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0876851A1] The device has a separator (2) and a slide surface (3) whose angle with respect to the horizontal is adjustable. The separator and slide surface carry the semiconductor material (1) to be classified. The material to be classified passes through the optical path (4) from a radiation source (5). A shape detection device (6) passes the shape of the material to a monitoring unit (7) which controls at least one deflection device (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/02 (2006.01); B07C 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 5/368 (2013.01); B07C 5/10 (2013.01); B07C 5/367 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0876851 A1 19981111; EP 0876851 B1 20011205; CN 1198966 A 19981118; DE 19719698 A1 19981112; JP H10314680 A 19981202; TW 397713 B 20000711; US 6040544 A 20000321

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59802292

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802292 20020117

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001024

1999-07-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE IT

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980507

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1998-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI