Global Patent Index - EP 0876857 A3

EP 0876857 A3 20000112 - Method for influencing strip profile in the edge region of a rolled strip

Title (en)

Method for influencing strip profile in the edge region of a rolled strip

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Beeinflussung der Bandkontur im Kantenbereich eines Walzbandes

Title (fr)

Procédé pour influencer le profil dans la zone des bords d'une bande laminée

Publication

EP 0876857 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98108139 A

Priority

DE 19719318 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0876857A2] The method concerns control of the contour of edge zones of a rolled strip, which compensates for the deliterious side effect of a roll with one-ended taper on the body zone of the roll gap. The method involves superposition of a conventional CVC (continuously variable crown) roll grind. The method uses special CVC rolls whose crown is determined by an offline calculation which are used as working rolls (1, 2).

IPC 1-7

B21B 37/40; B21B 13/14; B21B 27/02

IPC 8 full level

B21B 13/14 (2006.01); B21B 27/02 (2006.01); B21B 37/40 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

B21B 13/142 (2013.01); B21B 27/02 (2013.01); B21B 37/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4881396 A 19891121 - SEIDEL JUERGEN [DE], et al
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 05 31 May 1996 (1996-05-31) & US 5655397 A 19970812 - SATOH KAZUYUKI [JP], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 592 (M - 1502) 28 October 1993 (1993-10-28)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 05 31 May 1996 (1996-05-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 06 31 July 1995 (1995-07-31)
  • [A] ROSENTHAL D: "CVC TECHNOLOGY ON HOT AND COLD STRIP ROLLING MILLS", CAHIERS D'INFORMATIONS TECHNIQUES DE LA REVUE DE METALLURGIE,FR,REVUE DE METALLURGIE. PARIS, vol. 85, no. 7, July 1988 (1988-07-01), pages 597-606, XP000024459, ISSN: 0035-1563
  • [A] BUDAKVA A A ET AL: "MATHEMATICAL MODEL OF ROLL SET DEFORMATION IN SIX-HIGH AND FOUR-HIGH MILLS WITH AXIAL ROLL SHIFT", STEEL IN TRANSLATION,GB,THE INSTITUTE OF MATERIALS, LONDON, vol. 23, no. 4, pages 37-39, XP000425787, ISSN: 0967-0912

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

DOCDB simple family (publication)

EP 0876857 A2 19981111; EP 0876857 A3 20000112; AR 015115 A1 20010418; BR 9801600 A 19990601; CA 2237022 A1 19981108; CN 1198967 A 19981118; DE 19719318 A1 19981112; DE 19719318 C2 20030612; ID 20666 A 19990211; KR 19980086866 A 19981205; TW 407069 B 20001001; US 5943896 A 19990831

DOCDB simple family (application)

EP 98108139 A 19980505; AR P980102098 A 19980505; BR 9801600 A 19980507; CA 2237022 A 19980507; CN 98107949 A 19980507; DE 19719318 A 19970508; ID 980664 A 19980507; KR 19980016438 A 19980508; TW 87106492 A 19980428; US 7412798 A 19980507