Global Patent Index - EP 0876858 A3

EP 0876858 A3 2000-07-12 - Method for the manufacture of an article from a semi-finished product and internal high pressure device for carrying out the process

Title (en)

Method for the manufacture of an article from a semi-finished product and internal high pressure device for carrying out the process

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Bauteils aus einem Halbzeug und Innenhochdruckwerkzeug für die Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un élément à partir d'une ébauche semi-finie et appareil de haute pression interne pour réaliser cet élément

Publication

EP 0876858 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98102322 A

Priority

DE 19719676 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0876858A2] The method uses a multi-sectional internal high pressure forming tool with sealing system between tool and semi-finished part (5). The end of the section to be formed is fitted between a one piece inner and outer holder of an axial die (4). The upper and lower parts (1,2) of the forming tool are closed. The die is moved forward, the semi-finished part is centred, and the end of the section to be formed engages sealing on the end face (8) between the die holders. During advancement of the die, the forming process begins due to the effect of the internal pressure and the force of the axial cylinder. The process is continued until the finished component (5') is positioned on the inner wall of the forming tool.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 26/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/02 (2011.01); B21D 26/045 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0876858 A2 19981111; EP 0876858 A3 20000712; DE 19719676 A1 19981112

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020731

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010112;LT PAYMENT 20010112;LV PAYMENT 20010112;MK PAYMENT 20010112;RO PAYMENT 20010112;SI PAYMENT 20010112

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSEN KRUPP AUTOMOTIVE AG

1999-10-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSEN KRUPP AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI