Global patent index - EP 0876859 A3

EP 0876859 A3 2000-10-11 - Method and apparatus for making axle housings for motor vehicle

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for making axle housings for motor vehicle

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Herstellung von Kraftfahrzeugachsgehäusen

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de fabrication de carters d'essieu pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0876859 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98107664 A

Priority

DE 19719629 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0876859A2] The housing has a differential housing and axle halves, fabricated from a tubular hollow profile. High fluid pressure pushes the profile ends towards each other, and the profile is widened by an internal high pressure forming tool. The profile (1) is flattened on two opposite sections in the area of the differential housing. The flattened sections are given rigid support, and the housing is formed by expanding upsetting. A second hollow profile is separately formed into a conically bulging double part by expanding upsetting. This is cut centrally to form axle halves, which are connected to the differential housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 26/02; B21D 53/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/02 (2011.01); B21D 26/033 (2011.01); B21D 53/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/033 (2013.01); B21D 53/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 1501023 A 19240708 - GOODSPEED ELVIN S
  • [Y] US 5070717 A 19911210 - BOYD DAVID B [US], et al
  • [A] DE 1908729 A1 19690918 - NAKAMURA MASANOBU
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 005, no. 172 (M - 095) 31 October 1981 (1981-10-31)
  • [A] TERUMORI UEDA: "differential gear casings for automobiles by liquid bulge forming processes", SHEET METAL INDUSTRIES, vol. 60, no. 4, April 1983 (1983-04-01), london, pages 220 - 224, XP002145142

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0876859 A2 19981111; EP 0876859 A3 20001011; DE 19719629 A1 19981119; DE 19719629 C2 20010906

INPADOC legal status

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-12-20 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20001021

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1998-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI