Global Patent Index - EP 0876862 B1

EP 0876862 B1 2001-05-02 - Press with a workpiece feeder, with an integrated feed mechanism

Title (en)

Press with a workpiece feeder, with an integrated feed mechanism

Title (de)

Presse mit einer Werkstückzuführungeinrichtung mit einem integrierten Zuführmechanismus

Title (fr)

Presse avec un alimentateur de pièces, avec un mécanisme d'avance intégré

Publication

EP 0876862 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98500075 A

Priority

ES 9700943 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0876862A1] The workpiece feeder (1) is installed on a forming press with a horizontal plain (7) which is situated at a given distance (Z) from the floor. The feeder (1) comprises a sole carriage (6) for lifting the workpiece holder (14, 16) which also incorporates the feeder mechanism (9), to elevate the pieces (p) in direction "Z" and feed them in direction "X". The workpiece holder (14, 16) can be extended in direction "Y" for different pieces (p) by means of a motor mechanism (17) which is independent of the feeder mechanism (9). Only said feeder mechanism (9) is supported on the carriage (6) which is driven by a lifting device (4) secured to the press structure (2, 3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 43/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 43/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 43/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0876862 A1 19981111; EP 0876862 B1 20010502; DE 69800742 D1 20010607; DE 69800742 T2 20020529; ES 2150331 A1 20001116; ES 2150331 B1 20010401

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-07-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800742 20010607

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-03-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PRESS WITH A WORKPIECE FEEDER, WITH AN INTEGRATED FEED MECHANISM

2001-01-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PRESS WITH A WORKPIECE FEEDER, WITH AN INTEGRATED FEED MECHANISM

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990927

1999-07-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981014

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI