Global Patent Index - EP 0876880 A3

EP 0876880 A3 2002-11-27 - Drill- and/or percussion apparatus

Title (en)

Drill- and/or percussion apparatus

Title (de)

Bohr- und/oder Meisselgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de forage et/ou percussion

Publication

EP 0876880 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810142 A

Priority

DE 19714288 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0876880A2] The guide tube (9) for the striker piston has additional radially extending air passages (11) which are distributed circumferentially along at least one additional plane (E2) spaced apart from the plane (E1) of location of the first air passages (10). The two planes run parallel to each other. All the additional passages have the same cross-section which corresponds to the cross-section of the first passages.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 11/12; B25D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25D 11/04 (2006.01); B23B 45/16 (2006.01); B25D 11/00 (2006.01); B25D 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 11/125 (2013.01); B25D 11/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19714288 A1 19981008; CN 1065165 C 20010502; CN 1197716 A 19981104; DE 59813801 D1 20061228; EP 0876880 A2 19981111; EP 0876880 A3 20021127; EP 0876880 B1 20061115; JP 4195119 B2 20081210; JP H10309679 A 19981124; US 5975217 A 19991102

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59813801

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170214

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130223

2013-10-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130223

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100224

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-09-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100901

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090206

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090302

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090203

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070817

2007-02-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070201

2007-01-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813801 P 20061228

2006-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL SE

2006-11-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL SE

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030527

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 25D 11/12 A, 7B 25D 17/06 B

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI