Global Patent Index - EP 0876881 A3

EP 0876881 A3 2002-11-27 - Drill- and/or percussion apparatus

Title (en)

Drill- and/or percussion apparatus

Title (de)

Bohr- und/oder Meisselgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de forage et/ou percussion

Publication

EP 0876881 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810143 A

Priority

DE 19714287 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0876881A2] The pin (17), against which the striker (21) acts, has a second stop shoulder (19) at a distance from the first (18) in the direction of working action and pointing opposite the latter direction. The second stop shoulder interacts with a stop face (20) in axial communication with the guide tube (9) for the striker piston and pointing in the direction of working action. The distance between the two shoulders is greater than the distance between a stop for the selector fork and stop face in the tube.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 11/00; B25D 11/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25D 11/04 (2006.01); B23B 45/16 (2006.01); B25D 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 11/125 (2013.01); B25D 2250/035 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19714287 A1 19981008; CN 1066380 C 20010530; CN 1197717 A 19981104; DE 59813693 D1 20061005; EP 0876881 A2 19981111; EP 0876881 A3 20021127; EP 0876881 B1 20060823; JP H10309680 A 19981124; US 5992541 A 19991130

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180222

2018-03-14 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180222

2018-02-28 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20180222

2018-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-02-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59813693

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170210

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170214

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170214

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070524

2006-11-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-11-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061009

2006-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813693 P 20061005

2006-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL SE

2006-08-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL SE

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030527

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI