Global Patent Index - EP 0877095 A3

EP 0877095 A3 2000-01-12 - process and apparatus for preparing powdery ores for direct reduction

Title (en)

process and apparatus for preparing powdery ores for direct reduction

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Vorbereitung von Feinerzen für die Direktreduktion

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de préparation de minerais finement divisés pour la réduction directe

Publication

EP 0877095 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98102859 A

Priority

DE 19711629 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0877095A2] Fine ore with a broad particle size spectrum for direct reduction includes drying of particles smaller than 6.3 mm (preferably smaller than 3 mm) by means of hot air or flue gas stream during their pneumatic transport, and delivery of such dried particles down to a particle size of 0.04 mm to the direction process. The method is characterised by the following facts: a) particles smaller than 0.04 mm together with hot air or flue gas are subjected to fine separation; b) such particles are pelletised and dried after being moistened and provided with a bonding agent. The corresponding installation includes a multicyclone (10) for fine separation after the cycline (7), and a pelletising unit (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21B 13/00; C22B 1/00; C22B 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22B 1/16 (2006.01); C21B 13/00 (2006.01); C22B 1/00 (2006.01); C22B 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22B 1/2406 (2013.01); C21B 13/00 (2013.01); C22B 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19711629 A1 19980924; DE 19711629 C2 20000113; EP 0877095 A2 19981111; EP 0877095 A3 20000112; JP H10310827 A 19981124; ZA 9802360 B 19980929

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030104

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE GB IT LU

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000208

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 21B 13/00 A, 7C 22B 1/00 B, 7C 22B 1/24 B

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT LU

1998-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI