Global Patent Index - EP 0877116 A3

EP 0877116 A3 2000-11-22 - Alkali system for pad dyeing cellulosic textiles

Title (en)

Alkali system for pad dyeing cellulosic textiles

Title (de)

Alkalisystem zum Färben von Cellulosischen Textilien nach Klotzmethoden

Title (fr)

Système alcalin pour la teinture au foulard de textiles cellulosiques

Publication

EP 0877116 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98107390 A

Priority

DE 19719610 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0877116A2] In dyeing cellulosic textiles by a pad or spraying process, the dyeing or spraying solution contains 5-100 g/l inorganic polyphosphate (I) and has a pH of 10-13.5.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06P 1/673; D06P 3/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06P 1/673 (2006.01); D06P 3/66 (2006.01); D06P 1/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06P 1/67366 (2013.01); D06P 3/66 (2013.01); D06P 1/38 (2013.01); Y10S 8/918 (2013.01); Y10S 8/921 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0877116 A2 19981111; EP 0877116 A3 20001122; BR 9801593 A 19990706; DE 19719610 A1 19981112; ID 20816 A 19990311; IT 1292038 B1 19990125; IT MI971270 A1 19981130; IT MI971270 D0 19970530; TR 9800816 A2 20000721; US 5938796 A 19990817

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021031

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR IT PT

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT PT

1998-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI