Global Patent Index - EP 0877131 B1

EP 0877131 B1 2000-08-23 - Arrangement for connecting scaffolds to a wall or roof border

Title (en)

Arrangement for connecting scaffolds to a wall or roof border

Title (de)

Befestigungsvorrichtung für ein Gerüst an einer Wand oder einer Attika

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'UN ECHAFAUDAGE A UN MUR OU UN MUR PERIPHERIQUE DE TOITURE

Publication

EP 0877131 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98108007 A

Priority

  • DE 19718935 A
  • DE 19744087 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0877131A1] The mounting for the carrier beam (23) with a safety or working scaffold (1), at a wall (3) or fascia board (4), has a carrier mounting (11) for the anchor plate (12) with a slit and a bracket (13). A safety head (21) grips into the slit, and supports (22) act on the carrier beam (23). The length of the slit in the anchor plate (12) is shorter than the corresponding width of the end side of the convex radius formed by the safety head (21). A narrowing under the radius is smaller than the slit length. The safety head (21) thickness is slightly smaller than the width of the slit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 21/32; E04G 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 3/26 (2006.01); E04G 5/04 (2006.01); E04G 21/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 21/3219 (2013.01); E04G 3/26 (2013.01); E04G 5/04 (2013.01); E04G 21/3214 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0877131 A1 19981111; EP 0877131 B1 20000823; AT 195786 T 20000915

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIMON G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G. GERUST- UND BEFESTIGUNG

- Effective date: 20050531

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051201

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050502

2006-01-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIMON G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G. GERUST- UND BEFESTIGUNG

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-06-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050616

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-05-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-05-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2004-08-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040813

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040525

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-19 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20040519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040518

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040511

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040505

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040504

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800247 20000928

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL

2000-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195786 T 20000915

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990701

1999-07-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL

1999-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990319

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL

1998-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI