Global Patent Index - EP 0877144 B1

EP 0877144 B1 2002-09-04 - Device for connecting the flexible curtain of an overhead door with its straps

Title (en)

Device for connecting the flexible curtain of an overhead door with its straps

Title (de)

Verbindungsvorrichtung zwischen dem flexiblen Schirm eines Hubtores und seinen Gurtbändern

Title (fr)

Dispositif de liaison entre le rideau souple d'une porte de manutention et ses sangles

Publication

EP 0877144 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98420077 A

Priority

FR 9705788 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0877144A1] The flexible shutter which has horizontal reinforcing bars (3,4) and a traction bar connected to motor shaft by means of straps. A flexible link (18) engages the corresponding reinforcing bar (3,4) and a ring (21) holding the traction strap (11). The distance between the reinforcing bar and the ring varies according to the siting of the bar on the shutter. The flexible link has loops at each end for receiving the corresponding reinforcement bar and the ring respectively.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/262; E06B 9/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 5/14 (2006.01); E06B 9/262 (2006.01); E06B 9/56 (2006.01); E06B 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/0692 (2013.01); E06B 9/063 (2013.01); E06B 9/0676 (2013.01); E06B 2009/135 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0877144 A1 19981111; EP 0877144 B1 20020904; DE 69807569 D1 20021010; DE 69807569 T2 20030430; ES 2182250 T3 20030301; FR 2762869 A1 19981106; FR 2762869 B1 19990730; US 6116319 A 20000912

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120506

2013-08-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120505

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69807569

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120505

2013-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120505

2012-12-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121201

2012-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIMON BERNARD

- Effective date: 20120531

2011-10-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: MAVIFLEX, FR

- Effective date: 20110922

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110505

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110511

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110503

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110429

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110506

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-06 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES

2003-05-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0877144E

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182250 T3

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021112

2002-12-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807569 20021010

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020215

1999-07-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

1999-07-21 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19990429

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990507

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

1998-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI