Global Patent Index - EP 0877159 B1

EP 0877159 B1 2003-06-25 - Process for checking the operability of the heater of a lambda sensor in the exhaust pipe of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Process for checking the operability of the heater of a lambda sensor in the exhaust pipe of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Überprüfung der Funktionsfähigkeit der elektrischen Heizung einer Lambda-Sonde im Abgasrohr einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé de comtrôle du fonctionnement du chauffage de la sonde lambda dans l'échappement d'un moteur à combustion

Publication

EP 0877159 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98106013 A

Priority

DE 19719390 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0877159A2] The method involves measuring the electrical resistance (RL) of the heater when the heating current (IH) has been switched off and a measurement current (IM) applied which is lower than the heating current. The electrical resistance of the heater is connected to a positive voltage to apply the heating or measurement current.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14; F02D 41/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/409 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); G01N 27/26 (2006.01); G01R 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1494 (2013.01); F02D 41/1495 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0877159 A2 19981111; EP 0877159 A3 19991229; EP 0877159 B1 20030625; DE 19719390 A1 19981112; ES 2202676 T3 20040401; JP H1183790 A 19990326; US 5929328 A 19990727

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070403

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070402

2006-05-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060524

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060427

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060427

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060406

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060404

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2202676 T3

2003-10-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808786 P 20030731

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-09-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000620

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1998-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI