Global Patent Index - EP 0877169 A3

EP 0877169 A3 2000-01-19 - Hydraulic control device for the load-independent control of a double acting actuator

Title (en)

Hydraulic control device for the load-independent control of a double acting actuator

Title (de)

Hydraulische Steuereinrichtung zur lastdruckunabhängigen Steuerung eines doppeltwirkenden Motors

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande hydraulique indépendante de la pression de charge d'un moteur à double effet

Publication

EP 0877169 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98102270 A

Priority

DE 19719228 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0877169A2] The hydraulic control system for a double-action motor, independent of the loading, has a non-return valve (42) in the lateral channel (62) downstream from the pressure balance (12) and upstream of the piston slide (25) and separated from the throttle slide (48). The pressure pick-up opening (55) is upstream of the non-return valve. The relief mechanism is a piston section (30) at the piston slide which controls the connection between the measurement diaphragm chamber (20) at the outlet side and the adjacent feedback chamber (19). The throttle slide, in the start position, gives a throttled connection (51,49) between the pressure pick-up opening and the measurement chamber. The connection is blocked when the throttle slide is in the working position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 11/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/16 (2006.01); F15B 13/04 (2006.01); F15C 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0417 (2013.01); F15B 11/163 (2013.01); F15C 3/06 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30505 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30555 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3111 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3127 (2013.01); F15B 2211/351 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6054 (2013.01); F15B 2211/71 (2013.01); F15B 2211/78 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0877169 A2 19981111; EP 0877169 A3 20000119; EP 0877169 B1 20031203; DE 19719228 A1 19981112

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140210

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140210

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070210

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-04-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060407

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050216

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-08-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59810308

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT