Global Patent Index - EP 0877198 A3

EP 0877198 A3 2000-12-20 - Lighting apparatus

Title (en)

Lighting apparatus

Title (de)

Leuchte

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'éclairage

Publication

EP 0877198 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98108264 A

Priority

DE 19719184 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0877198A2] The lighting unit is built around four profile strips (3) which form the corners of the unit and which support the different components which make up the various units. The profile strips have groove and are shaped to form the corners. The light is assembled from cross-pieces (12) comprising side sections (11) which fit into the corner profile grooves and cross walls (10) and light fittings. The sides are fitted with profile sections (17) and the ends of the lighting unit are fitted with end walls (15) secured by screws into the ends of the profile strips. The profile strips also support different types of light diffuser panels and grilles etc. The strips form the basis of a variety of lighting units assembled in a modular manner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 2/00; F21V 15/015

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 15/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 15/01 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19719184 C1 19981008; EP 0877198 A2 19981111; EP 0877198 A3 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-10-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21S 2/00 A, 7F 21V 15/015 B, 7F 21Y 103:00 Z

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI