Global Patent Index - EP 0877210 A3

EP 0877210 A3 2000-05-17 - Connecting assembly for a wall mounted heater

Title (en)

Connecting assembly for a wall mounted heater

Title (de)

Anschlussvorrichtung für ein Wandheizgerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif de raccordement pour chaudière murale

Publication

EP 0877210 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98104979 A

Priority

DE 19719293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0877210A2] The apparatus-side connections (36,38,40) are fixed to shell-type form parts (26,28,30,32), preferably a deep-drawn plate part which is fixed on the installation plate (10) in a position covering over the corresponding through passage aperture. The water-conducting conduits are formed as forward and back flow conduits of a heating network and also as a cold water and user hot water conduit. Valves are provided for opening and closing water throughflow passages. The form parts coaxial to the through passage aperture covered by them have a connection for the upper part (48) of a valve (50) monitoring the throughflow aperture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/12; F24H 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/12 (2006.01); F24H 9/14 (2006.01); F24H 1/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/122 (2013.01); F24H 9/14 (2013.01); F24H 9/142 (2013.01); F24H 1/48 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0877210 A2 19981111; EP 0877210 A3 20000517; DE 19719293 A1 19981112

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030709

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI