Global Patent Index - EP 0877222 A3

EP 0877222 A3 2000-02-23 - Device for injecting pressurized fluids in a plate-like heat exchanger and process for cleaning this injection device

Title (en)

Device for injecting pressurized fluids in a plate-like heat exchanger and process for cleaning this injection device

Title (de)

Anlage zum Druckspritzen von Fluiden in einem Plattenwärmetauscher und Verfahren zur Reinigung dieser Druckspritzanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'injection de fluides sous pression dans un échangeur thermique à plaques et procédé de nettoyage d'un tel dispositif d'injection

Publication

EP 0877222 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 98400981 A

Priority

FR 9705736 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0877222A2] The pressurised fluid injection device is for plate heat exchanger comprising a sealed enclosure (2) having inlet and exhaust for a first pressurised fluid. A plate bundle (1) located in the enclosure is composed of a plate stack (10) having flow channels between them for a first fluid mixed with a second pressurised fluid and for a heat conducting fluid. An injection tube (21) for the second fluid has calibrated orifices (26) and extends over the whole width of the plate bundle. The injection tube has a closed (21a) end and open (21b) end connected to a supply pipe (22) of the second fluid provided with a shut off valve (23). The open end is also connected to a pipe (24) for evacuating the particles deposited on a filter placed inside the tube upstream of the branching of the two pipes (22,24). The evacuation tube has a shut off valve (25).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 27/02; F28D 9/00; F28F 19/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/02 (2006.01); F25B 43/00 (2006.01); F28D 9/00 (2006.01); F28F 19/01 (2006.01); F28F 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/0273 (2013.01); F28D 9/00 (2013.01); F28F 19/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0877222 A2 19981111; EP 0877222 A3 20000223; EP 0877222 B1 20011121; DE 69803235 D1 20020221; DE 69803235 T2 20020822; ES 2168727 T3 20020616; FR 2763118 A1 19981113; FR 2763118 B1 19990806; JP 3990030 B2 20071010; JP H1151589 A 19990226; US 6196301 B1 20010306

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160418

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160413

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160504

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168727 T3

2002-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020216

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803235 20020221

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010430

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1998-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI