Global Patent Index - EP 0877282 A3

EP 0877282 A3 2000-09-13 - Liquid crystal display device and apparatus for using the same

Title (en)

Liquid crystal display device and apparatus for using the same

Title (de)

Flüssigkristall-Anzeigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affichage à cristal liquide

Publication

EP 0877282 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98300390 A

Priority

  • JP 807297 A
  • JP 28715797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0877282A2] The object of the present invention is to provide a transflective liquid display device which is capable of providing efficient transmissive display without damaging brightness in the reflective display. A transflective liquid crystal display device comprising a liquid crystal panel having a liquid crystal compound (105) sandwiched between a pair of opposing substrates (103, 106) and transparent electrodes (104), a first polarizer (101) disposed on the viewer's side of said liquid crystal panel, a reflective polarizer (108) disposed on the opposite side of the liquid crystal panel as against said first polarizer, and a backlight assembly (109, 110), wherein said reflective polarizer has the function of transmitting the polarisation component with a predetermined orientation, while transmitting the polarisation component with a different orientation and wherein said backlight assembly is substantially black in the non-emissive state. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02F 1/1335

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/1335 (2006.01); G02F 1/13357 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/13362 (2013.01); G02F 1/133536 (2013.01); G02F 1/133553 (2013.01); G02F 2001/133545 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] WO 9701788 A1 19970116 - MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0877282 A2 19981111; EP 0877282 A3 20000913; EP 0877282 B1 20040908; CN 1133890 C 20040107; CN 1188902 A 19980729; DE 69826059 D1 20041014; DE 69826059 T2 20050127; JP H10260403 A 19980929; TW 520456 B 20030211; US 6008871 A 19991228

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-07-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130627 AND 20130703

2013-07-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: JAPAN DISPLAY WEST INC., JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20130619

2013-07-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JAPAN DISPLAY WEST INC., JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69826059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130521

2013-07-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JAPAN DISPLAY WEST INC., OGAWA, JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69826059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130521

2013-07-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69826059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MITSCHERLICH & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAE, DE

- Effective date: 20130521

2013-07-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69826059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MITSCHERLICH, PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTM, DE

- Effective date: 20130521

2013-07-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69826059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MITSCHERLICH, PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, PART, DE

- Effective date: 20130521

2013-05-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69826059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MITSCHERLICH & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAE, DE

2011-04-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JAPAN DISPLAY WEST INC., OGAWA, JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69826059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110207

2010-10-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2010-08-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100729 AND 20100804

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-05-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69826059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021107

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010227

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 02F 1/1335 A

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI