Global Patent Index - EP 0877566 B1

EP 0877566 B1 2000-11-15 - SPORTS' SHOE, IN PARTICULAR FOOTBALL BOOT

Title (en)

SPORTS' SHOE, IN PARTICULAR FOOTBALL BOOT

Title (de)

SPORTSCHUH, INSBESONDERE FUSSBALLSCHUH

Title (fr)

CHAUSSURE DE SPORT, EN PARTICULIER CHAUSSURE DE FOOTBALL

Publication

EP 0877566 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97901010 A

Priority

  • DE 19601219 A
  • EP 9700122 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19601219C1] The invention relates to a sports' shoe, in particular a football boot, with an upper (1) comprising an instep region (8), with a sole (2) connected to the upper and with tension strips (3, 4, 5) for stiffening. The sole is stiffened by a front tension strip (3) connecting the front end (6) of the sole to the upper (1) and by two rear tension strips (4, 5) connecting the heel area (7) of the sole (2) to the upper (1) in such a manner that although it is still possible to bend the sole up completely, it is impossible to bend it down.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/02; A43B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/00 (2006.01); A43B 5/02 (2006.01); A43B 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/00 (2013.01); A43B 5/02 (2013.01); A43B 5/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19601219 C1 19970102; AT 197533 T 20001215; AU 1441197 A 19970811; AU 712111 B2 19991028; CZ 286605 B6 20000517; CZ 9802155 A3 19990317; EP 0877566 A1 19981118; EP 0877566 B1 20001115; ES 2153647 T3 20010301; GR 3035320 T3 20010430; JP 2001510350 A 20010731; JP 3594619 B2 20041202; PL 183250 B1 20020628; PL 327824 A1 19990104; PT 877566 E 20010430; RU 2171083 C2 20010727; SK 282901 B6 20030109; SK 93798 A3 20000313; US 6151804 A 20001128; WO 9725889 A1 19970724

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702640

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702640

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130113

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130113

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-11-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PUMA SE, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PUMA AG RUDOLF DASSLER SPORT, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 59702640

- Effective date: 20130912

2013-11-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702640

- Representative's name: GOSDIN, MICHAEL, DIPL.-ING.UNIV. DR.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20130912

2013-10-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-09-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130113

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120114

2013-07-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130708

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130131

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120114

2012-09-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120201

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-08-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100118

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PUMA A.G. RUDOLF DASSLER SPORT

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-07-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040113

2004-01-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040113

2003-01-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20030130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030129

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-14 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030114

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-09 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030109

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-07 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030107

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-03 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030103

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010206

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153647 T3

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010112

2001-02-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-12-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702640 20001221

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197533 T 20001215

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991019

1998-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980718

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE