Global Patent Index - EP 0877788 B1

EP 0877788 B1 2000-05-24 - SOLID, WATERLESS PREPARATIONS

Title (en)

SOLID, WATERLESS PREPARATIONS

Title (de)

FESTE, WASSERFREIE ZUBEREITUNGEN

Title (fr)

PREPARATIONS SOLIDES ET ANHYDRES

Publication

EP 0877788 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97903271 A

Priority

  • DE 19606619 A
  • EP 9700668 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19606619A1] The proposal is for solid, virtually waterless preparations consisting of (a) 5 to 50 wt.% acid cellulases, (b) 10 to 20 wt.% highly ethoxylated fatty alcohol polyglycol ethers and (c) inorganic and/or organic salts to 100 wt.%. The preparations are particularly suitable for producing dyed cotton fabric, especially blue denim, with a "stonewash" effect.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/386; C11D 1/72; C11D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C12S 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/38645 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 3/2086 (2013.01); D06P 5/151 (2013.01); D06P 5/158 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES

EPO simple patent family

DE 19606619 A1 19970828; EP 0877788 A1 19981118; EP 0877788 B1 20000524; ES 2147978 T3 20001001; WO 9731089 A1 19970828

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20031122

2002-02-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020214

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010131

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2147978

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES

1999-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981207

1998-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980813

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES