Global Patent Index - EP 0877789 B1

EP 0877789 B1 2001-03-21 - WASHING AGENTS CONTAINING AMORPHOUS ALKALI SILICATES AND PEROXIDE BLEACHING AGENTS

Title (en)

WASHING AGENTS CONTAINING AMORPHOUS ALKALI SILICATES AND PEROXIDE BLEACHING AGENTS

Title (de)

WASCHMITTEL, ENTHALTEND AMORPHE ALKALISILIKATE UND PEROXYBLEICHMITTEL

Title (fr)

DETERGENT CONTENANT DES SILICATES ALCALINS AMORPHES ET DES AGENTS DE BLANCHIMENT PEROXYDE

Publication

EP 0877789 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96937318 A

Priority

  • DE 19541755 A
  • EP 9604743 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19541755A1] The claimed washing agents contain amorphous alkali silicates with secondary washing capabilities and a molar ratio M2O:SiO2 (M = alkali metal) of between 1:1.5 and 1:3.3 in quantities of at least 5 wt.%; up to 30 % percarbonate, the weight ratio of alkali silicate to percarbonate being at least 1:1; 0-10 wt.% zeolite (as a proportion of water-free active material) and/or crystalline layered silicates of general formula NaMSixO2x+1<.>yH2O in which M is sodium or hydrogen, x is a number between 1.9 and 4 and y is a number between 0 and 20, the crystalline layered silicates being present only in quantities of less than 10 wt.%. The claimed washing agents have not only better primary washing capabilities but also improved secondary washing capabilities than comparable agents containing only perborate as a peroxide bleaching agent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/39; C11D 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/08 (2013.01); C11D 3/3942 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0639639 A1 19950222 - PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19541755 A1 19970515; AT 199932 T 20010415; EP 0877789 A1 19981118; EP 0877789 B1 20010321; ES 2156298 T3 20010616; WO 9717421 A1 19970515

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061102

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20061102

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070629

2006-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-11-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051012

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051010

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-10-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041028

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-02 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27C

- Effective date: 20031003

2002-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20011031

2002-04-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: UNILEVER PLC

2002-02-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: UNILEVER PLC

- Effective date: 20011218

2001-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2156298

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-06-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606648

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-26

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT NL

2001-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 199932

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991110

1998-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980504

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT NL