Global Patent Index - EP 0877791 B1

EP 0877791 B1 2000-05-31 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF MOULDED BODIES CONSISTING OF A WASHING OR CLEANING AGENT

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF MOULDED BODIES CONSISTING OF A WASHING OR CLEANING AGENT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WASCH- ODER REINIGUNGSMITTELFORMKÖRPERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CORPS MOULES CONSTITUES D'UN PRODUIT DE LAVAGE OU DE NETTOYAGE

Publication

EP 0877791 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97900991 A

Priority

  • DE 19601840 A
  • EP 9700087 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19601840A1] The invention relates to moulded bodies consisting of a washing or cleaning agent containing surfactants, which can be prepared by a process known per se. Said bodies demonstrate an excellent capacity to dissolve and disintegrate in water while at the same time having a good level of pressure stability when an amorphous sodium silicate with less than 15 % by weight of water, in a solid form, is added to the ingredients, in particular when they are prepared using microwave technology.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/08 (2013.01); C11D 17/0086 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19601840 A1 19970724; AT 193548 T 20000615; EP 0877791 A1 19981118; EP 0877791 B1 20000531; ES 2148923 T3 20001016; WO 9726317 A1 19970724

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

2002-06-12 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20011211

2002-06-12 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20011211

2002-03-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020320

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020131

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020111

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020110

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020109

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2001-04-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-01-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010102

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-11-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001009

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2148923

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701807

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-06

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 193548

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990525

1999-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WILSBERG, HEINZ-MANFRED

1999-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WITT, SANDRA

1999-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VOGT, GUENTHER

1999-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KRUSE, HANS-FRIEDRICH

1999-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BAUER, VOLKER

1999-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ASSMANN, GEORG

1998-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980711

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL