Global Patent Index - EP 0877807 B1

EP 0877807 B1 2003-06-25 - BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE AND PARTICULARLY PEPTIDE MOLECULES HAVING A POTENTIATING EFFECT ON GROWTH HORMONE BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITY

Title (en)

BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE AND PARTICULARLY PEPTIDE MOLECULES HAVING A POTENTIATING EFFECT ON GROWTH HORMONE BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITY

Title (de)

BIOLOGISCH AKTIVE STOFFE INSBESONDERE PEPTIDE, DIE EINEN VERSTÄRKENDEN EFFEKT AUF DIE BIOLOGISCHE AKTIVITÄT DES WACHSTUMSHORMONS HABEN

Title (fr)

MOLECULES BIOLOGIQUEMENT ACTIVES PLUS PARTICULIEREMENT PEPTIDIQUES AYANT UN EFFET POTENTIALISATEUR DE L'ACTIVITE BIOLOGIQUE DE L'HORMONE DE CROISSANCE

Publication

EP 0877807 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97901145 A

Priority

  • FR 9700127 W
  • FR 9600956 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9727298A1] A peptide construct including all or part of the sequence between positions 104 and 113 of growth hormone GH, or a homologous sequence cross-reactive therewith, is disclosed. The peptide fragment is covalently bonded to a transporter peptide and/or an adjuvant, and is capable of having an in vivo potentiating effect on the biological activity of said growth hormone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/18; A23K 1/165; A61K 39/385; C07K 14/61

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 1/305 (2006.01); A23K 1/165 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61P 5/00 (2006.01); A61P 5/06 (2006.01); C07K 7/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/61 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/3955 (2013.01); A23K 20/168 (2016.05); A23K 20/184 (2016.05); C07K 14/61 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9727298 A1 19970731; AR 005559 A1 19990623; AT 243749 T 20030715; AU 1449297 A 19970820; AU 722064 B2 20000720; BR 9707067 A 19991228; CA 2243845 A1 19970731; CA 2243845 C 20121009; CN 1130459 C 20031210; CN 1209841 A 19990303; DE 69723055 D1 20030731; DE 69723055 T2 20040401; EP 0877807 A1 19981118; EP 0877807 B1 20030625; ES 2202571 T3 20040401; FR 2744123 A1 19970801; FR 2744123 B1 19980417; JP 2000509964 A 20000808; NZ 326401 A 20000327; US 6455049 B1 20020924; ZA 9700614 B 19970731

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170121

2017-02-15 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170121

2017-01-25 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170121

2017-01-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69723055

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160118

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151231

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160113

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160108

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040123

2004-10-20 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CARELLI CLAUDE MARCEL HENRI

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2202571 T3

2004-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040123

2004-01-22 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040122

2004-01-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040122

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2003-09-25 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-09-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-09-25 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-09-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69723055 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARELLI, CLAUDE MARCEL HENRI

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000511

1998-12-23 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19980724

1998-12-16 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

1998-11-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980724

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE