Global patent index - EP 0877950 A4

EP 0877950 A4 2000-01-26 - RADIO NAVIGATION SYSTEM USING OUT-OF-BAND PSEUDOLITES

Title (en)

RADIO NAVIGATION SYSTEM USING OUT-OF-BAND PSEUDOLITES

Title (de)

FUNKNAVIGATIONSSYSTEM MIT AUF EIGENER FREQUENZ SENDENDEN PSEUDOLITEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE RADIONAVIGATION UTILISANT DES PSEUDOLITES HORS BANDE

Publication

EP 0877950 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97905625 A

Priority

  • US 9701238 W
  • US 59513796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9728455A1] A system of stationary pseudolite navigation transmitters for broadcasting a GPS-like signal at a frequency F1, a non-GPS carrier frequency, is provided in the environment of GPS spread spectrum navigation signals at a radio frequency L1. A plurality of pseudolite stations (PL) broadcast a plurality of spread spectrum pseudolite navigation signals at a radio frequency F1 which are at a different frequency than the frequency L1. According to the invention, at least one reference station (REF) is provided for receiving the GPS navigation and the pseudolite navigation signals and deriving navigation correction data (Differential GPS, kinematic observations data) signals. At least one of the pseudolite stations serves as a master station (PL1) in association with each reference station. A communication link provides differential GPS and observation data signals from each reference receiver to its master pseudolite station(s) which modulate(s) the reference station observations and integrity data for broadcasting to a plurality of mobile receivers (NRX) which receive the pseudolite and GPS navigation signals including the navigation correction signals from the master pseudolite stations and produce accurate navigation information therefrom in the presence or absence of useful GPS navigation signals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01S 5/14; G01S 5/02; H04B 7/185

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01S 5/14 (2006.01); G01S 19/07 (2010.01); G01S 19/11 (2010.01); G01S 19/41 (2010.01); G01S 19/43 (2010.01); G01S 19/46 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01S 19/11 (2013.01); G01S 19/07 (2013.01); G01S 19/41 (2013.01); G01S 19/43 (2013.01); G01S 19/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9728455 A1 19970807; AU 2246497 A 19970822; CA 2242193 A1 19970807; EP 0877950 A1 19981118; EP 0877950 A4 20000126

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040803

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030521

2000-01-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991213

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7G 01S 5/14 A, 7G 01S 5/02 B, 7H 04B 7/185 B

1999-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HANSON, PETER

1999-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOLDEN, THOMAS

1998-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980723

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE