Global Patent Index - EP 0877980 A4

EP 0877980 A4 2000-03-29 - A SET-TOP BOX WITH AN INTERNET BIOS FOR INTERNET ACCESS

Title (en)

A SET-TOP BOX WITH AN INTERNET BIOS FOR INTERNET ACCESS

Title (de)

SET-TOP-BOX MIT EINEM INTERNET-BIOS FÜR INTERNET-ZUGRIFF

Title (fr)

DECODEUR INTEGRE A UN RECEPTEUR DE TELEVISION ET POURVU D'UN SYSTEME BIOS INTERNET PERMETTANT L'ACCES AU RESEAU INTERNET

Publication

EP 0877980 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97904131 A

Priority

  • US 9701554 W
  • US 59463896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9728499A1] A set-top box for receiving and decoding data streams to provide video display on a display monitor (20, 22) has a unique Internet BIOS (IBIOS) adapted for providing a user interface on a connected display monitor (20, 22), providing facility for a user to access and display Web pages from the Internet World Wide Web. The IBIOS is installed in a non-volatile memory (47), and comprises a basic input output (BIOS) code set, an operating system, a Transfer Control Protocol/Internet Protocol (TCP/IP) code set, an embedded Web Browser application, and a top managing application. The set-top box is computer based, and has, in various embodiments, various capability for receiving and decoding incoming data streams and providing display from the data streams on a connected display monitor (20, 22), which may be a television set (20) or other monitor (22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/00; H04N 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 15/00 (2006.01); G06F 9/445 (2006.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04N 5/00 (2011.01); H04N 5/44 (2011.01); H04N 5/445 (2011.01); H04N 5/765 (2006.01); H04N 7/16 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/4401 (2013.01); G06F 9/4401 (2013.01); G06F 9/44573 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04L 69/161 (2013.01); H04N 5/44543 (2013.01); H04N 21/25891 (2013.01); H04N 21/4181 (2013.01); H04N 21/42646 (2013.01); H04N 21/42676 (2013.01); H04N 21/443 (2013.01); H04N 21/4622 (2013.01); H04N 21/4782 (2013.01); H04N 21/4821 (2013.01); H04N 21/64322 (2013.01); H04L 69/16 (2013.01); H04N 2005/4441 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] EP 0760568 A1 19970305 - INT COMPUTERS LTD [GB]
  • [A] EP 0670652 A1 19950906 - FIRSTPERSON INC [US]
  • [XYA] BISSELL R A ET AL: "THE SET-TOP BOX FOR INTERACTIVE SERVICES", BT TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, vol. 13, no. 4, 1 October 1995 (1995-10-01), pages 66 - 77, XP000538881, ISSN: 0265-0193
  • [Y] RIESMAN R R: "THE MISSING LINK ? (CD-ROM/ONLINE HYBRIDS)", CD-ROM PROF. (USA), CD-ROM PROFESSIONAL, April 1995 (1995-04-01), pages 66 - 74, XP002123655
  • [A] HUANG Y -H ET AL: "DESIGN OF AN MPEG-BASED SET-TOP BOX FOR VIDEO ON DEMAND SERVICES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP), DETROIT, MAY 9 - 12, 1995 IMAGE AND MULTI-DIMENSIONAL SIGNAL PROCESSING/ SIGNAL PROCESSING APPLICATIONS DEVELOPMENT, vol. 4, no. CONF. 20, 9 May 1995 (1995-05-09), INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, pages 2655 - 2658, XP000535478, ISBN: 0-7803-2432-3
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 03 28 April 1995 (1995-04-28) & US 5896557 A 19990420 - SUZUKI KAZUO [JP], et al
  • [A] GESSLER S ET AL: "PDAs as mobile WWW browsers", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, vol. 28, no. 1, 1 December 1995 (1995-12-01), pages 53-59, XP004001210, ISSN: 0169-7552
  • [A] "DAS TELEFON ZUM FERNSEHEN", FUNKSCHAU, vol. 58, no. 19, 1 September 1986 (1986-09-01), pages 34 - 36, XP002022117, ISSN: 0016-2841
  • [A] "PERSONAL MEDIA USING PERSONAL COMPUTER MEMORY CARD INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION CARDS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 38, no. 9, 1 September 1995 (1995-09-01), pages 489, XP000540340, ISSN: 0018-8689
  • See also references of WO 9728499A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9728499 A1 19970807; CN 1232562 A 19991020; EP 0877980 A1 19981118; EP 0877980 A4 20000329; JP 2000504134 A 20000404

INPADOC legal status


2001-05-30 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010403

2000-03-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000208

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 9/00 A, 7H 04N 5/00 B

1998-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980810

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB