Global patent index - EP 0878150 A3

EP 0878150 A3 2000-03-15 - Inflatable support

Title (en)

Inflatable support

Title (de)

Aufblasbare Stütze

Title (fr)

Support gonflable

Publication

EP 0878150 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98303914 A

Priority

GB 9709958 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0878150A2] An inflatable support (e.g. a mattress or seat cushion) comprises a plurality of elongate inflatable cells (12) containing a solid deformable material such as resilient foam, beads or fibres. Typically, the cells are inflated and deflated periodically by means of a pump (P). The solid within the cells reduces the volume of air within the cells, and thus a pressure pump of a lower rating for supplying pressurised air can be used. Moreover, if the supply of pressurised air should fail for any reason a patient on the mattress will still be supported by the deformable material within the cell. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 27/10; A47C 27/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/18 (2006.01); A61G 7/057 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/10 (2013.01); A47C 27/082 (2013.01); A47C 27/088 (2013.01); A47C 27/18 (2013.01); A61G 7/05776 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0878150 A2 19981118; EP 0878150 A3 20000315; CA 2237994 A1 19981117; GB 9709958 D0 19970709

INPADOC legal status

2001-06-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-12-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47C 27/10 A, 7A 47C 27/18 B, 7A 61G 7/057 B

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI