Global Patent Index - EP 0878151 A3

EP 0878151 A3 2000-12-20 - A sitting or lying support comprising elastic spheres

Title (en)

A sitting or lying support comprising elastic spheres

Title (de)

Sitz- oder Liegestütze aus elastischen Kugeln

Title (fr)

Support d'assise ou de couchage à sphères souples

Publication

EP 0878151 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 98401130 A

Priority

FR 9705968 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0878151A2] The seat or bed support is constituted by a number of flexible spheres (1) with an intermediate empty space (2) between them for the circulation of air. The spheres are connected to each other to form a juxtaposed layer. Several layers (A,B,C) of spheres are superposed and displaced from each other so that the spheres are housed in the spaces of the neighbouring layer and thus fitted into each other. The spheres of one layer are applied against each other along a rectangular or triangular frame. The spheres allow air ventilation to occur and enable a more or less hard structure to be obtained.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 3/16; A47C 27/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 3/16 (2006.01); A47C 27/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/12 (2013.01); A47C 3/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0878151 A2 19981118; EP 0878151 A3 20001220; FR 2763227 A1 19981120; FR 2763227 B1 19990806

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-10-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47C 3/16 A, 7A 47C 27/12 B

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI