Global Patent Index - EP 0878154 A3

EP 0878154 A3 2000-11-02 - Garment display frame

Title (en)

Garment display frame

Title (de)

Rahmen zur Austellung von Kleidungsstücken

Title (fr)

Cadre pour la présentation de vêtements

Publication

EP 0878154 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98303808 A

Priority

GB 9709647 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0878154A2] A garment display frame for knitwear or the like is disclosed. The knitwear frame comprises a body member 101 having a pair of transverse legs 102 adapted to extend laterally outwards to engage the interior of a garment via a neck portion thereof to mount the body member 101 to the exterior of the garment. A pair of fold members 106 extend from lateral outer portions of the body member 101 to enable respective lateral outer portions of the garment to be folded around each said fold member. Clamping means 104, 105 are arranged adjacent each end of the body member 101 for receiving respective lateral outward portions of the garment when folded around the fold members 106 and/or a bottom portion of the garment when folded upwards. A locking flap 111 and hinges 113 are provided for enabling the legs 102 to be moved towards each other to enable the display frame to be removed from the garment. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 7/19; B65D 85/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/19 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/19 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0878154 A2 19981118; EP 0878154 A3 20001102; EP 0878154 B1 20060719; DE 69835252 D1 20060831; GB 9709647 D0 19970702

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2008-05-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070514

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070511

2007-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070420

2007-05-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-12-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061219

2006-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061030

2006-10-20 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061020

2006-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69835252 P 20060831

2006-08-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL PT

2006-07-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-07-19 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-07-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-07-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030401

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL PT

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010426

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47F 7/19 A, 7B 65D 85/18 B

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL PT

1998-11-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI