Global Patent Index - EP 0878181 B1

EP 0878181 B1 2002-09-25 - Device for Washing Crotch Region of Patient

Title (en)

Device for Washing Crotch Region of Patient

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Waschen des Gesässes eines Patienten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de lavage du séant d'un patient

Publication

EP 0878181 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97303271 A

Priority

EP 97303271 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0878181A1] A device for washing the crotch region of a patient, including a base, a nozzle secured on the base for ejecting a washing liquid, a lower cushioning member provided on the base and having an opening so that the washing liquid ejected from the nozzle passes through the opening. A cover having an upper cushioning member provided with a recess portion is detachably mounted over the base with the lower cushioning member being in pressure contact with the upper cushioning member such that a washing chamber is defined by the recess, the opening and the base. The lower and upper cushioning members are shaped for supporting the femoral and lumbar regions of the patient therebetween such that the pubic region and the anal region of the patient are positioned in the washing chamber and are washed with the washing liquid ejected from the nozzle. A discharge port is provided in the base for discharging the used washing liquid from the washing chamber. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 35/00 (2006.01); A61H 33/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 35/00 (2013.01); A61H 33/08 (2013.01); A61H 2201/163 (2013.01); A61H 2203/0456 (2013.01); A61H 2205/085 (2013.01); A61H 2205/086 (2013.01); A61H 2205/087 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0878181 A1 19981118; EP 0878181 B1 20020925; DE 69715820 D1 20021031; DE 69715820 T2 20030605

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090514

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080530

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-01-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-05-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715820 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020301

1999-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990517

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT