Global Patent Index - EP 0878214 A3

EP 0878214 A3 2000-04-05 - Process and apparatus for remedying polluted media

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for remedying polluted media

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Sanierung von verunreinigten Medien

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour décontaminer des milieux pollués

Publication

EP 0878214 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98303882 A

Priority

  • JP 12554197 A
  • JP 2711098 A
  • JP 8670498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0878214A2] A process to remedy a polluted medium includes contacting a first medium containing a pollutant with a second medium containing a microorganism which is capable of decomposing the pollutant. A membrane permeable to the pollutant and impermeable to the microorganism is spaced between the first and second media. The first medium and the second medium may flow in opposite directions to each other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62D 3/00; B09C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 1/20 (2006.01); A62D 3/00 (2007.01); A62D 3/02 (2007.01); B01D 53/34 (2006.01); B01D 53/81 (2006.01); B01D 53/84 (2006.01); B09C 1/10 (2006.01); C02F 3/00 (2006.01); C02F 3/34 (2006.01); C12M 1/00 (2006.01); C12M 1/12 (2006.01); C12S 5/00 (2006.01); C12S 99/00 (2010.01); A62D 101/22 (2007.01); C12R 1/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B09C 1/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0878214 A2 19981118; EP 0878214 A3 20000405; EP 0878214 B1 20040929; CA 2237767 A1 19981115; CA 2237767 C 20020917; DE 69826558 D1 20041104; DE 69826558 T2 20051006; JP 3673640 B2 20050720; JP H11285684 A 19991019; US 6319706 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090514

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090514

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080520

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080531

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69826558 P 20041104

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040929

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010907

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1998-11-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI