Global Patent Index - EP 0878219 B1

EP 0878219 B1 2003-06-04 - Rollerskates with removable shoe

Title (en)

Rollerskates with removable shoe

Title (de)

Rollschuhe mit abnehmbarem Schuh

Title (fr)

Patin à roulettes à chaussure amovible

Publication

EP 0878219 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98810006 A

Priority

FR 9705862 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0878219A1] The roller skate comprises a chassis (2) with rollers (3) and a removable boot fixed to the chassis at four non-aligned points. Locking of the boot to the chassis is automatically ensured by deformation of a spring during booting up, The automatic locking comprises a fastening and locking part (8) subject to the action of a locking spring (16). The skate has an unlocking lever (19) articulated in the chassis rear which acts on the fastening part against the action of the locking spring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/00 (2006.01); A63C 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/06 (2013.01); A63C 2017/0053 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0878219 A1 19981118; EP 0878219 B1 20030604; DE 69815206 D1 20030710; DE 69815206 T2 20040415; FR 2763003 A1 19981113; FR 2763003 B1 19990723

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070108

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061221

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061221

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815206 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

1998-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980919

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1998-11-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI