Global Patent Index - EP 0878248 A3

EP 0878248 A3 2001-05-30 - Sleeve for rotary printing presses

Title (en)

Sleeve for rotary printing presses

Title (de)

Basisträgerhülse für Rotationsdruckmaschinen

Title (fr)

Manchon pour presses à imprimer rotatives

Publication

EP 0878248 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98103114 A

Priority

DE 19720551 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0878248A2] Casing used in rotary printing, is made by winding onto a cylindrical mandrel (17), and removing subsequently. Novel features include the first layer (10) of narrow tape, wound on at a set pitch (winding angle alpha ), which is covered with a further material (14). Preferably this covering lies over the line of abutment (13) between windings of the first layer. It comprises more of the same material. An adhesive is used between layers. This is an anaerobic system comprising a sandwich-forming epoxy system. The tape is a temperature-resistant, thin metal foil.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 37/12; B41N 10/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/14 (2006.01); B21C 37/12 (2006.01); B41F 13/08 (2006.01); B41F 30/00 (2006.01); B41N 1/00 (2006.01); B41N 10/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/123 (2013.01); B41F 13/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0878248 A2 19981118; EP 0878248 A3 20010530; DE 19720551 A1 19981119; JP H10323970 A 19981208; US 5974973 A 19991102

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031107

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030425

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21C 37/12 A, 7B 41N 10/04 B

1998-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980223

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-11-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI