Global Patent Index - EP 0878252 B1

EP 0878252 B1 2000-04-12 - Mould for automatic moulding plant and method for producing such a mould

Title (en)

Mould for automatic moulding plant and method for producing such a mould

Title (de)

Giessform für automatisch arbeitende Formanlagen sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung der Giessformen

Title (fr)

Moule pour installation de moulage automatic et procédé de fabrication d'un tel moule

Publication

EP 0878252 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98103795 A

Priority

  • DE 19720056 A
  • US 25616999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0878252A1] The mould includes a mould box formed by box halves (4), with means for transport in an automatically operating mould making installation, and a bonded sand mould (8) which possibly are provided with cores (13), a pouring funnel (6) and a riser (9). In the region of its separation plane the mould box is provided with an elongate cutout (5). Both the funnel (6) and the outlet of the riser (9), which is formed in the sand mould (8), are located in the region of this cutout.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22C 21/00; B22C 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/02 (2006.01); B22C 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/02 (2013.01); B22C 21/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0878252 A1 19981118; EP 0878252 B1 20000412; AT 191664 T 20000415; DE 19720056 A1 19981119; ES 2145634 T3 20000701; PL 326238 A1 19981123; US 6244328 B1 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130305

2014-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130304

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800122

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120326

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120516

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-10-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-03-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030304

2002-11-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2002-09-18 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20020603

2002-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020329

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020326

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020322

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020306

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020304

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020227

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DISA INDUSTRIES A/S

2001-03-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DISA INDUSTRIES A/S

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145634 T3

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800122 20000518

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000418

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191664 T 20000415

2000-03-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

1999-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990115

1999-01-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981201

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-11-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI