Global Patent Index - EP 0878398 B1

EP 0878398 B1 2000-12-13 - Method and apparatus for folding the end flap of a blank for a cigarette box

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for folding the end flap of a blank for a cigarette box

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Falten der Kopflasche eines Zuschnitts für eine Zigarettenschachtel

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour plier le rabat terminal d'un flan pour une boîte à cigarettes

Publication

EP 0878398 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98108020 A

Priority

DE 19720500 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0878398A1] The top flap (4) is placed against the inside of the front wall (6) of a hinged lid. The side areas (21) of the top flap projecting over the width of the front wall of the lid are bent forwards at predetermined bend lines (23) which can be pre-weakened. The top flap is moved during folding between side pieces of a mouth piece whose spacing from each other is less than the width of the top flap and its side areas. A blank is moved into a folding position. The top flap is moved towards the inner face of a front wall of the lid adjoining the top flap along a fold line. The side areas of the flap projecting over the width of the front of the lid are bent forwards and the blank is then moved on for further folding and finishing processes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 19/22; B31B 1/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/20 (2006.01); B31B 1/52 (2006.01); B65B 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/228 (2013.01); B31B 50/52 (2017.08); Y10S 493/91 (2013.01); Y10S 493/911 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0878398 A1 19981118; EP 0878398 B1 20001213; CN 1093069 C 20021023; CN 1110430 C 20030604; CN 1199699 A 19981125; CN 1282699 A 20010207; DE 19720500 A1 19981119; EP 0963908 A1 19991215; EP 0963908 B1 20011205; ES 2153695 T3 20010301; ES 2167979 T3 20020516; HK 1016552 A1 20030627; JP H1111416 A 19990119; US 6113525 A 20000905; US 6322486 B1 20011127

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040503

2005-05-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041201

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-12-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040502

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040503

2004-05-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040502

2003-06-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030610

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030530

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030528

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030522

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030422

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030422

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153695 T3

2001-02-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800381 20010118

2001-01-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-11-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991119

1999-12-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES LI

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990505

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1998-11-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI