Global patent index - EP 0878567 A3

EP 0878567 A3 2001-01-17 - Polyolefin fibres and polyolefin yarns and textile materials thereof

Title (en)

Polyolefin fibres and polyolefin yarns and textile materials thereof

Title (de)

Polyolefinfasern und Polyolefingarne und daraus hergestellte textile Flächengebilde

Title (fr)

Fibres de polyoléfines et fils de polyoléfines et produits textiles les utilisant

Publication

EP 0878567 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98107669 A

Priority

  • DE 19720135 A
  • DE 19722579 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0878567A2] The claims cover polyolefin fibres and yarns with high strength and elongation at break produced by melt processing, especially fibres with capillary titres of 1-10 dtex, elongation at break > 130% and tensile strength NOTLESS 15 cN/tex that are not redrawn, and textile fabrics produced from them. They consist of polypropylene mixtures containing 0.05-10, preferably 0.2-3 wt.% modified propylene polymers (I) with melt indices of 0.1-50, preferably 1-40 g/10 minutes at 230 degrees C/2.16 kg and a ratio of intrinsic viscosity of (I) to the intrinsic viscosity of the unmodified polypropylene of the same weight average molecular weight (Mw) of 0.20-0.95. (I) are obtained by (a) treating propylene homopolymers and/or copolymers of propylene and ethylene and/or 4-18 carbon (C) alpha -olefins with polyfunctional ethylenically unsaturated monomers in the presence of ionising radiation and/or thermal free radical initiators; or (b) reacting functionalised polypropylene, preferably containing acid and/or acid anhydride groups, with polyfunctional compounds of opposite reactivity, preferably 2-16 C diamines and/or 2-16 C diols. Also claimed is a method of making these materials.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 6/06; D01F 1/10; D01F 6/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 1/10 (2006.01); D01F 6/06 (2006.01); D01F 6/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/46 (2013.01); D01F 1/10 (2013.01); D01F 6/06 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2913 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2931 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2964 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2967 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0878567 A2 19981118; EP 0878567 A3 20010117; EP 0878567 B1 20040929; CZ 298667 B6 20071212; CZ 9801437 A3 19990512; US 2002002241 A1 20020103; US 6218011 B1 20010417; US 6537473 B2 20030325

INPADOC legal status

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100428

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BOREALIS G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20100430

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090422

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090414

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-09-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-04-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040929

2005-01-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050109

2004-12-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59812014

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040929

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030818

2002-04-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010706

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOREALIS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-02-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOREALIS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

1998-11-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI