Global Patent Index - EP 0878582 B1

EP 0878582 B1 2001-01-24 - Joint sealing

Title (en)

Joint sealing

Title (de)

Fugendichtung

Title (fr)

Joint d'étanchéité

Publication

EP 0878582 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97107960 A

Priority

EP 97107960 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0878582A1] The seals between the sections of the bridge deck (12) and the lateral pedestrian deck (14) are offset and parallel. The main seal (20) runs to a set depth and the outer ends are angled to form a short section (38) to which the secondary (pedestrian) seals (22) are bonded to form a waterproof connection. The main seals form a skirt over the edge of the bridge support and the seal construction allows relative movement between the main deck and the pedestrian deck without water entering the bridge structure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01D 19/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0878582 A1 19981118; EP 0878582 B1 20010124; AT 198920 T 20010215; DE 59702953 D1 20010301

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160419

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-06-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702953 20010301

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE NL

2001-01-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198920 T 20010215

2000-11-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STOG, ARNULF

2000-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STOG, ARNULF

2000-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000324

1999-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE NL

1999-01-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981130

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE NL

1998-11-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI