Global Patent Index - EP 0878589 A3

EP 0878589 A3 2000-03-29 - Method for manufactoring a sound absorbing element for buildings

Title (en)

Method for manufactoring a sound absorbing element for buildings

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Schallschultzelementes für Bauten

Title (fr)

Procédé pour fabriquer un élément d'insonorisation pour bâtiments

Publication

EP 0878589 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98108701 A

Priority

  • DE 19720082 A
  • DE 19725712 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0878589A2] In a process to make sound-deadening panels to be incorporated into walls, ceilings, floors, or doors, panels are fabricated using recycled cotton fibres compressed to form mats. Before the pressing process, the mats are soaked with a binding agent which is a duroplastic or thermoplastic and free of phenol resins. The pressed mats are accorded a coating of non-woven fleece fibre and/or a foil.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/74; E04B 1/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/84 (2006.01); E04B 1/86 (2006.01); E04B 1/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/86 (2013.01); E04B 1/84 (2013.01); E04B 2001/745 (2013.01); E04B 2001/746 (2013.01); E04B 2001/8461 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0878589 A2 19981118; EP 0878589 A3 20000329

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011201

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-11-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI