Global Patent Index - EP 0878598 A3

EP 0878598 A3 2000-09-20 - Security door and frame assembly

Title (en)

Security door and frame assembly

Title (de)

Aus einer Tür und einem Türrahmen bestehendes Sicherheitssystem

Title (fr)

Ensemble de porte avec une porte de sécurité et un cadre pour cette porte

Publication

EP 0878598 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98303822 A

Priority

GB 9709793 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0878598A2] A security door and frame assembly comprises door 10 pivotally mounted in frame 20. Door 10 has interior and exterior surfaces and frame 20 has a slot 23 to receive bolt 30 mounted on the interior of door 10. Bolt 30 is operable between a first position in which it engages with frame 20 to secure door 10 in a closed condition, and a second position in which it is withdrawn from frame 20, allowing door 10 to pivot open. Lock 50 mounted on the interior of door 10 is operable between a locking condition in which it locks bolt 30 in said first position, and a release condition in which it allows bolt 30 to be released. Means accessible from both sides of door 10 are provided for moving bolt 30 between said first and second positions when lock 50 is in said release condition. Lock 50 is pivotable out of the plane of door 10 to release bolt 30 even when lock 50 is in its locking condition. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/20; E05B 65/10; E05C 1/02; E05D 3/02; E05D 7/12; E06B 3/92

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/20 (2006.01); E05C 1/02 (2006.01); E05D 7/10 (2006.01); E06B 3/92 (2006.01); E05B 65/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/1055 (2013.01); E05B 17/203 (2013.01); E05C 1/02 (2013.01); E06B 3/92 (2013.01); E05B 65/10 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0878598 A2 19981118; EP 0878598 A3 20000920; GB 2325264 A 19981118; GB 9709793 D0 19970709

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-07-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI