Global patent index - EP 0878599 A3

EP 0878599 A3 2000-03-29 - Lock

Title (en)

Lock

Title (de)

Schloss

Title (fr)

Serrure

Publication

EP 0878599 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98106680 A

Priority

DE 29708703 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0878599A2] The lock has a latch (2) which can be pulled from its locked position against the force of a spring (2a) by a lug on a profile cylinder. It also has two additional bars (5) with which a door can be locked, and which can be moved in opposite directions by a handle only after the latch has been pulled back. The latch and the bars can be moved from their locked positions by an emergency handle on an emergency release. Both the handle and the emergency handle are arranged on a common axis (9) of rotation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/00; E05B 65/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/18 (2006.01); E05B 65/10 (2006.01); E05C 9/04 (2006.01); E05B 13/00 (2006.01); E05B 35/08 (2006.01); E05B 63/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/042 (2013.01); E05B 63/185 (2013.01); E05B 65/1006 (2013.01); E05C 9/047 (2013.01); E05B 13/004 (2013.01); E05B 35/08 (2013.01); E05B 63/042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29708703 U1 19970710; AT 246303 T 20030815; EP 0878599 A2 19981118; EP 0878599 A3 20000329; EP 0878599 B1 20030730

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59809125

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100414

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-01-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STEINBACH & VOLLMANN G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040411

2004-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: STEINBACH & VOLLMANN GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2004-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STEINBACH & VOLLMANN GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-02-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: STEINBACH & VOLLMANN GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2003-11-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: STEINBACH & VOLLMANN GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59809125

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 05B 65/00 A, 7E 05B 65/10 B

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

1998-11-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI