Global Patent Index - EP 0878600 A3

EP 0878600 A3 2000-01-05 - Device driven by an electrical motor for opening a window or a door by a tilting movement

Title (en)

Device driven by an electrical motor for opening a window or a door by a tilting movement

Title (de)

Elektromotorisch angetriebene Kippöffnungsvorrichtung für Fenster, Türen oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'ouverture basculante pour portes ou fenêtres actionné par un moteur électrique

Publication

EP 0878600 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98105485 A

Priority

DE 19719941 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0878600A2] The arrangement has a panel drive unit mounted on the window aperture frame and a coupling element on the window panel frame with a locking device which interacts with a locking counter element on the aperture frame. The locking device (9) has an electric motor drive. A first sensor (24) detects the closed position of the window. A second sensor (25) detects the locked position of the locking device. Both sensors can be in or on the housing (20) of the locking device or separately in or on the housings of the panel drive unit, coupling element or locking device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/52; E05B 17/22; E05B 47/00; E05F 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/22 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05F 15/12 (2006.01); E05C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05B 17/22 (2013.01); E05F 15/63 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0068 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0069 (2013.01); E05C 9/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0878600 A2 19981118; EP 0878600 A3 20000105; EP 0878600 B1 20031105; AT 253681 T 20031115; DE 19719941 A1 19981119; DE 19719941 C2 20030227

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130326

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130326

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810052

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130326

2013-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 253681 T

- Effective date: 20130326

2013-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120308

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120416

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120216

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120224

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ROTO FRANK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: ROTO FRANK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#STUTTGARTER STRASSE 145-149#70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ROTO FRANK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#STUTTGARTER STRASSE 145-149#70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN (DE)

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040209

2003-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. R.C. SALGO EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEY

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810052 P 20031211

2003-11-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2003-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021008

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

1998-11-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI