Global Patent Index - EP 0878618 B1

EP 0878618 B1 2002-09-25 - Water cooled cylinder block

Title (en)

Water cooled cylinder block

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitsgekühltes Zylinderkurbelgehäuse

Title (fr)

Bloc cylindres refroidi par eau

Publication

EP 0878618 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98107816 A

Priority

DE 19720380 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19720380C1] The housing (1) has outer walls (2), which form a top flange face for a cylinder head, and a cooling-water jacket (4), which is open to the flange face. A water-inlet union (7) is connected to the jacket. The cylinders (6) are spaced from the outer walls. A body (8) inserted in the jacket encloses the cylinders or a block (5) containing them. The inside surface (9) of the body is clear of the outer surfaces (10) of the cylinders or of the block. The intervening gap (11) is connected to the inlet union. The shape of the body can match that of the jacket, or a spoiler can be formed on it. The spoiler protrudes towards the union to divide the incoming water into two currents passing through holes in the body on either side of it. The currents are directed along the cylinders at opposite sides of the housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/10 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01); F02B 75/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 7/0007 (2013.01); F02F 1/10 (2013.01); F02F 1/108 (2013.01); F02B 2075/1816 (2013.01); F02F 2001/104 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19720380 C1 19980709; EP 0878618 A2 19981118; EP 0878618 A3 19990526; EP 0878618 B1 20020925; US 5988120 A 19991123

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2004-04-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040415

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010508

2000-03-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-02-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR GB IT

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990508

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

1998-11-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI