Global patent index - EP 0878667 A3

EP 0878667 A3 2000-09-27 - Pyrolytic self-cleaning ovens

Title (en)

Pyrolytic self-cleaning ovens

Title (de)

Kochofen mit pyrolitischer Selbstreinigung

Title (fr)

Four de cuisson à nettoyage par pyrolyse

Publication

EP 0878667 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98303828 A

Priority

GB 9709974 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0878667A2] A pyrolytic self-cleaning oven has a cavity 2 heated by a grill element 4 during a self-cleaning pyrolytic operation, the fumes emitted passing through a porous plug bearing an oxidation catalyst 11 to remove smoke before the gases are vented at outlet 9. The cycling of the element 4 is controlled by an electronic controller 13 which receives a signal from a temperature sensor 15 on the catalytic plug. Thus, when the oven temperature initially rises and volatile substances are vaporised, resulting in an exothermic reaction at the catalyst, the element 4 is switched off. Only when a substantial amount of the volatile soil has been evaporated will the temperature at the oxidation catalyst fall causing the control means 13 to switch the element 4 back on. In this way, the self-cleaning operation is controlled by the temperature of the oxidation catalyst, and the cleaning operation is terminated with reference to either a fixed temperature in the oven having been reached or a fixed temperature differential between the catalyst temperature and the oven temperature having been achieved. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 14/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 14/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 14/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0878667 A2 19981118; EP 0878667 A3 20000927; GB 2325299 A 19981118; GB 2325299 B 20000112; GB 9709974 D0 19970709

INPADOC legal status

2001-07-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-06-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001201

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI