Global Patent Index - EP 0878806 B1

EP 0878806 B1 2002-11-27 - Insulator system for conducting wire and/or -ribbon under voltage for electrical fences

Title (en)

Insulator system for conducting wire and/or -ribbon under voltage for electrical fences

Title (de)

Isolatorsystem für stromführende Leiterdrähte und/oder -bänder für elektrische Weidezäune

Title (fr)

Système d'isolateur pour fils et/ou rubans conducteurs sous tension pour clôture électrique

Publication

EP 0878806 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98107685 A

Priority

DE 29708790 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0878806A2] The system has each insulator fabricated in two parts (1a,1b) in mirror-image relationship, joined together by a strap (2) and closed by a clamp (3) formed integrally on one part for snapping over the end of the other part. Alternatively the closure may be held by a screw through collinear holes (4.1). Each part has a through hole (5) large enough for it to be fitted around a fence-post, with a concentric seal (19) for exclusion of moisture. The live wires or strips are guided and/or retained in grooves (6) also arranged in mirror-image relationship in the juxtaposed faces of the two parts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 17/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01K 3/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29708790 U1 19970807; AT 228710 T 20021215; EP 0878806 A2 19981118; EP 0878806 A3 19990210; EP 0878806 B1 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050428

2005-04-26 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20050426

2004-04-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040429

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040428

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040427

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040426

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806395 20030109

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228710 T 20021215

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010823

2000-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DITTER PLASTIC OHG

1999-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR LI

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990223

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

1998-11-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI