Global Patent Index - EP 0878878 A3

EP 0878878 A3 2001-04-04 - Sensor device for force measurement

Title (en)

Sensor device for force measurement

Title (de)

Aufnahmeadapter zur Kraftmessung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de détection pour mesurer la force

Publication

EP 0878878 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98108619 A

Priority

DE 29708336 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0878878A2] The reception adapter has a multiple of force sensors (14, 16), housed in a lower part (12) connected with the force receiver e.g. a crimping punch, acted on with a force in a loaded condition. For the prodn. of an electrical evaluatable signal as a reaction to the loading. An upper part (10) is provided at a distance to the lower part (12) in the loading direction, and works in conjunction with the force transmitter eg. the crimping press. The force sensors are so arranged and designed, that they are loaded bending moment free in the loading condition and besides the multiple of force sensors (14, 16), otherwise no frictional connection results between the lower part (12) and the upper part (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/048

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/048 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/0486 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0878878 A2 19981118; EP 0878878 A3 20010404; EP 0878878 B1 20050112; AT 287132 T 20050115; DE 29808574 U1 19980820

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090529

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-07-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STEINEL SOLUTIONS AG

- Free text: STEINEL AG#ALLMEINDSTRASSE 10#8840 EINSIEDELN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- STEINEL SOLUTIONS AG#ALLMEINDSTRASSE 10#8840 EINSIEDELN (CH)

2006-01-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-05-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812478 P 20050217

2005-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2002-01-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH LI

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010926

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH LI

1998-11-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI