Global Patent Index - EP 0879063 A4

EP 0879063 A4 2001-12-12 - PREPARATION AND USE OF MAGNETICALLY SUSCEPTIBLE POLYMER PARTICLES

Title (en)

PREPARATION AND USE OF MAGNETICALLY SUSCEPTIBLE POLYMER PARTICLES

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG VON MAGNETISIERBAREN POLYMERTEILCHEN

Title (fr)

PREPARATION ET UTILISATION DE PARTICULES DE POLYMERES A SUSCEPTIBILITE MAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 0879063 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95943894 A

Priority

US 9516559 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9722366A1] The present invention is broadly directed to magnetically susceptible polymer particles having specifically-tailored adsorptivities and to related processes involving the particles (e.g., making the particles; separating target compounds from other compounds using the particles; and delivering selected compounds to targeted areas of concentration using the particles). The designed adsorptivities of the particles arise from either (i) selected adsorbents in the particles; or (ii) recognition sites in the particles formed by the molecular imprinting polymerization reactions used to make the particles. Of particular interest are particles and processes that involve biologically active substances, e.g., pharmaceuticals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 51/00; G01N 33/543; G01N 33/553

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/50 (2006.01); B03C 1/01 (2006.01); G01N 33/543 (2006.01); H01F 1/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B03C 1/01 (2013.01); A61K 9/5094 (2013.01); G01N 33/5434 (2013.01); H01F 1/111 (2013.01); G01N 2446/10 (2013.01); G01N 2446/20 (2013.01); G01N 2446/40 (2013.01); G01N 2600/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] US 5091206 A 19920225 - WANG CHAO-HUEI [US], et al
  • [A] US 5288763 A 19940222 - LI NAI-HONG [US], et al
  • [Y] GLAD, MAGNUS ET AL: "Molecularly imprinted composite polymers based on trimethylolpropane trimethacrylate (TRIM) particles for efficient enantiomeric separations", REACT. POLYM. (1995), 25(1), 47-54, XP000505034
  • [Y] HOSOYA, KEN ET AL: "Uniform-size macroporous polymer-based stationary phase for HPLC prepared through molecular imprinting technique", CHEM. LETT. (1994), (8), 1437-8, XP002179409
  • [A] SELLERGREN, BOERJE: "Imprinted dispersion polymers: a new class of easily accessible affinity stationary phases", J. CHROMATOGR., A (1994), 673(1), 133-41, XP000482411
  • See also references of WO 9722366A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9722366 A1 19970626; AU 4524696 A 19970714; EP 0879063 A1 19981125; EP 0879063 A4 20011212

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060406

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030113

2001-12-12 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 51/00 A, 7G 01N 33/553 B, 7G 01N 33/543 B

1998-11-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980709

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE