Global patent index - EP 0879066 A4

EP 0879066 A4 2000-02-09 - APPARATUS AND METHOD OF REDUCING THE PAIN OF A SUBCUTANEOUS INJECTION

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHOD OF REDUCING THE PAIN OF A SUBCUTANEOUS INJECTION

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND METHODE ZUR VERMINDERUNG VON SCHMERZ EINER SUBKUTANINJEKTION

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DIMINUER LA DOULEUR LORS D'UNE INJECTION SOUS-CUTANEE

Publication

EP 0879066 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96940939 A

Priority

  • AU 9600792 W
  • AU PN700995 A
  • AU PO400896 A
  • AU PO272096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9720588A1] A hand-held tool (1), adapted to reduce the pain caused by a subcutaneous injection from a hypodermic needle (19), said tool comprising a tip (3) extending therefrom, an operative means (6) adapted to vibrate the tip (3) whereby in use the tip (3) is placed against the tissue into which the injection is to be given, so as to induce vibrations in the tissue, both before and during the injection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 5/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 5/20 (2006.01); A61M 5/315 (2006.01); A61M 5/42 (2006.01); A61M 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 5/422 (2013.01); A61M 5/20 (2013.01); A61M 5/31581 (2013.01); A61M 5/31595 (2013.01); A61M 5/24 (2013.01); A61M 5/425 (2013.01); A61M 2005/31588 (2013.01); A61M 2205/583 (2013.01); A61M 2205/8206 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9720588 A1 19970612; CA 2243945 A1 19970612; EP 0879066 A1 19981125; EP 0879066 A4 20000209

INPADOC legal status

2000-12-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000701

2000-06-07 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R17P

- Effective date: 19980605

2000-02-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61M 5/42 A, 7A 61M 5/315 B, 7A 61C 1/08 B, 7A 61M 37/00 B

2000-02-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19991229

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

1998-11-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980609

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB GR IT LI NL SE